24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVI1601316 | COVAULT, PATRICK S | 9/30/2016 | |||||||
WIMBERLY, JESSE L vs COVAULT, PATRICK S | |||||||||
CVG1601315 | TURNER, DAVYKA | 9/30/2016 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs TURNER, DAVYKA | |||||||||
CVF1601307 | LAVERDET, MARCI | 9/29/2016 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs LAVERDET, MARCI | |||||||||
CVF1601308 | MOORE, REGINALD | 9/29/2016 | |||||||
SANDIA RESOLUTION COMPANY LLC vs MOORE, REGINALD | |||||||||
CVI1601309 | BEAVER, MATT | 9/29/2016 | |||||||
WHITE, REGINA L vs BEAVER, MATT | |||||||||
CVH1601306 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 9/28/2016 | |||||||
HOOVER, EDGAR R. vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1601305 | CAMMON, ROSEA | 9/28/2016 | |||||||
ROOKWOOD PROPERTIES DBA CHATEAU VILLAGE vs CAMMON, ROSEA | |||||||||
CVG1601304 | MOWERY, JAMIE | 9/28/2016 | |||||||
MIKU FOUNTAINHEAD, LLC DBA FOUNTAINHEAD APARTMENTS vs MOWERY, JAMIE | |||||||||
CVG1601303 | HARRIS, TATIANA | 9/28/2016 | |||||||
DAYTONA PARKWAY DEVELOP LLC DBA DAYTONA VILLAGE APTS vs HARRIS, TATIANA | |||||||||
CVG1601302 | MCCONNELL, JESSICA | 9/28/2016 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP DBA TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS vs MCCONNELL, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVH1601301 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 9/28/2016 | |||||||
BALDWIN, ANDREW J. vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVI1601298 | TURNER, OLIVETTE | 9/27/2016 | |||||||
R.J. PRO TINT LLC vs TURNER, OLIVETTE | |||||||||
CVH1601299 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 9/27/2016 | |||||||
BAILEY, JOSHUA vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
CVG1601300 | TANNER, MORGAN | 9/27/2016 | |||||||
NANCY PINARD, LTD. vs TANNER, MORGAN | |||||||||
CVH1601291 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 9/26/2016 | |||||||
YOUNG, KEVIN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
CVI1601292 | BRAND, STEVEN A | 9/26/2016 | |||||||
PAT CLARK vs BRAND, STEVEN A | |||||||||
CVI1601293 | MASON, JENNIFER D | 9/26/2016 | |||||||
HADDER, BLAKE C vs MASON, JENNIFER D | |||||||||
CVF1601294 | DOW, KENNETH JR. | 9/26/2016 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs DOW, KENNETH JR. | |||||||||
CVG1601295 | MITCHELL, JESSE A. | 9/26/2016 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC. vs MITCHELL, JESSE A. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 865, 866, 867 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |