24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVI1700200 | BENSON, DEBORAH | 2/9/2017 | |||||||
CARRIAGE TRAIL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (HOA) vs BENSON, DEBORAH | |||||||||
CVI1700199 | WILLIAMS, NARKETA | 2/9/2017 | |||||||
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCAITES LLC DBA UNITED CHECK CASHING vs WILLIAMS, NARKETA | |||||||||
CVG1700194 | COX, AMANDA | 2/8/2017 | |||||||
COLLIER, HAROLD vs COX, AMANDA | |||||||||
CVF1700195 | ADAMS, SHIRLEY K | 2/8/2017 | |||||||
BROWN SCHOOL STATION APTS LLC vs ADAMS, SHIRLEY K | |||||||||
CVF1700196 | SPRENKEL, AUSTIN | 2/8/2017 | |||||||
UC HEALTH LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC CO LPA vs SPRENKEL, AUSTIN | |||||||||
CVF1700191 | MADDEN, JOEY | 2/7/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MADDEN, JOEY | |||||||||
CVF1700192 | WILT, MICHAEL E | 2/7/2017 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P.C. vs WILT, MICHAEL E | |||||||||
CVF1700193 | WILT, PATRICIA A | 2/7/2017 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P.C. vs WILT, PATRICIA A | |||||||||
CVF1700183 | ADAMS, MATTHEW | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs ADAMS, MATTHEW | |||||||||
CVI1700190 | IAQUINTA, JAIME | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
ARVAI, ROBERT M JR vs IAQUINTA, JAIME | |||||||||
CVI1700189 | RISSER, MARK | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
ARVAI, ROBERT M JR vs RISSER, MARK | |||||||||
CVG1700188 | MITCHELL, DAWN | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
MIDWEST PROPERTY RENTALS LLC C/O MICHAEL DUGAN, MEMBER vs MITCHELL, DAWN | |||||||||
CVH1700187 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
HENDRICKSON, JEFFREY J. vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1700186 | WRIGHT-WILLIAMS, NADIA R. | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WRIGHT-WILLIAMS, NADIA R. | |||||||||
CVF1700185 | BODENMILLER, JULIE | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs BODENMILLER, JULIE | |||||||||
CVF1700184 | BALLARD, KELLY | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs BALLARD, KELLY | |||||||||
CVF1700182 | LUTE, JANICE | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LUTE, JANICE | |||||||||
CVF1700181 | ALEXANDER, ASHLEY F. | 2/6/2017 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P.C. vs ALEXANDER, ASHLEY F. | |||||||||
CVG1700174 | BOLDS, CRYSTIALE | 2/3/2017 | |||||||
MIKU FOUNTAINHEAD, LLC DBA FOUNTAINHEAD APARTMENTS vs BOLDS, CRYSTIALE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 819, 820, 821 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |