Daily Law Journal
15452 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVH1301192 PEEP ZEE REALITY 9/6/2013
SIMMONS, TERRY vs PEEP ZEE REALITY
CVG1301191 DAVIS, JACQUELINE 9/6/2013
RSB INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA RSBI ENTERPRISES vs DAVIS, JACQUELINE
CVG1301190 ELLIOTT, ROBERT 9/5/2013
HEINDL, LARRY vs ELLIOTT, ROBERT
CVF1301186 EDWARDS, ALEXANDER 9/4/2013
BAILEY, KALESHA vs EDWARDS, ALEXANDER
CVG1301189 BACK, STEPHANIE 9/4/2013
GREMLING, CHRIS vs BACK, STEPHANIE
CVG1301187 NAPIER, FRANCIS JAMES 9/4/2013
BOGGESS, LARRY vs NAPIER, FRANCIS JAMES
CVG1301185 SURBAUGH, DAVID 9/4/2013
COUNTY CORP. INC. vs SURBAUGH, DAVID
CVH1301188 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 9/4/2013
ARNETT, JON vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1301181 BERGER, JASON 9/3/2013
ABBEY CREDIT UNION, INC. vs BERGER, JASON
CVF1301184 LAMBDIN, ANNETTE 9/3/2013
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LAMBDIN, ANNETTE
CVG1301179 WHITE, BEATRICE 9/3/2013
WILSON, BARTON L. vs WHITE, BEATRICE
CVF1301182 EATON, ELIZABETH 9/3/2013
CACH, LLC vs EATON, ELIZABETH
CVG1301180 DYKES, RUTH N. 9/3/2013
WILSON, BARTON L. vs DYKES, RUTH N.
CVI1301183 ADAMS, DENNIS 9/3/2013
PHILLIPS, MEGAN A vs ADAMS, DENNIS
CVI1301178 MESSER, KANDISS 8/30/2013
NEY, BARBARA A vs MESSER, KANDISS
CVF1301176 SUMMERS, JENNIFER 8/30/2013
CYPRESS FINANCIAL vs SUMMERS, JENNIFER
CVG1301177 HAIRSTON, DERRICK 8/30/2013
RICHMOND, JEFFERY G. vs HAIRSTON, DERRICK
CVI1301173 BAKER, SHANNON 8/29/2013
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs BAKER, SHANNON
CVF1301174 ECKLEY, LAUREN M. 8/29/2013
WRIGHT STATE UNIVERSITY C/O STATE OF OHIO vs ECKLEY, LAUREN M.

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 721, 722, 723 ... 771, 772, 773  Next