24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1800014 | STEPHENSON, NICOLE | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs STEPHENSON, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVF1800015 | MICHAELS, RANDY S | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAELS, RANDY S | |||||||||
CVG1800016 | MONTGOMERY, JASON | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
FREEDOM FOR LIVING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs MONTGOMERY, JASON | |||||||||
CVF1800013 | BODY, MARCUS | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BODY, MARCUS | |||||||||
CVG1800008 | MOORE, FREDA | 1/3/2018 | |||||||
HOUCK, RON vs MOORE, FREDA | |||||||||
CVG1800009 | WILSON, SHERIDAN | 1/3/2018 | |||||||
MCGRATH, JAMES vs WILSON, SHERIDAN | |||||||||
CVF1800005 | FISCHER, BRIANNA N. | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs FISCHER, BRIANNA N. | |||||||||
CVF1800007 | WILLIAMS, KENYETTA | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
L&T HOME RENTALS vs WILLIAMS, KENYETTA | |||||||||
CVF1800006 | BRATCHETTE, TERRY L JR | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs BRATCHETTE, TERRY L JR | |||||||||
CVF1800004 | ESTEPP, KIMBERLY J. | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs ESTEPP, KIMBERLY J. | |||||||||
CVF1800003 | PETERMAN PINSON, EARLA V. | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC vs PETERMAN PINSON, EARLA V. | |||||||||
CVI1800002 | BRYANT, SHANIKA | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
THOMPSON, MEGHAN vs BRYANT, SHANIKA | |||||||||
CVG1800001 | CAMPBELL, JOSHUA | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
DBC REAL ESTATE MGMT LLC STONERIDGE APARTMENTS vs CAMPBELL, JOSHUA | |||||||||
CVG1701993 | DAVIS-CALDWELL, TONYA | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
FOP FAIR OAKS LLC vs DAVIS-CALDWELL, TONYA | |||||||||
CVI1701994 | JAMROCK AUTOMOTIVE LLC | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
FOUT, DEBORAH vs JAMROCK AUTOMOTIVE LLC | |||||||||
CVG1701995 | CRAFT, CASSANDRA | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS vs CRAFT, CASSANDRA | |||||||||
CVH1701996 | PETIT, DON | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
VILLHAUER, RYAN vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVG1701991 | ACKLEY, CHADWICK | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
MONROE FEDERAL SAVINGS AND vs ACKLEY, CHADWICK | |||||||||
CVG1701992 | JOHNSON, ARMINTA | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
FIRST REALTY GROUP FOR: REPUBLIC INVESTMENTS INC vs JOHNSON, ARMINTA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 719, 720, 721 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |