24763 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1800195 | WILSON, ERICA J | 2/2/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs WILSON, ERICA J | |||||||||
CVG1800184 | BOGGS, PAUL | 2/1/2018 | |||||||
WAX, REGINALD B. vs BOGGS, PAUL | |||||||||
CVG1800185 | HILL, TERRY | 2/1/2018 | |||||||
EL-ABBADI, HISHAM vs HILL, TERRY | |||||||||
CVF1800186 | CLINE, STEVE R II | 2/1/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs CLINE, STEVE R II | |||||||||
CVF1800187 | BARWICK, HENRY L. III | 2/1/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC vs BARWICK, HENRY L. III | |||||||||
CVF1800188 | ALEXANDER, KATINA | 2/1/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC vs ALEXANDER, KATINA | |||||||||
CVH1800189 | PETIT, DON | 2/1/2018 | |||||||
CHRISTY, LEROY SHANNON vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVF1800182 | COCHRAN, MATHEW | 1/31/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs COCHRAN, MATHEW | |||||||||
CVF1800183 | BURTON, KAREN | 1/31/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs BURTON, KAREN | |||||||||
CVF1800178 | WADE, ANTHONY M | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs WADE, ANTHONY M | |||||||||
CVH1800181 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
TILTON, DALE E. III vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1800180 | HERNDON, TOYA | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs HERNDON, TOYA | |||||||||
CVF1800179 | BRANDELL, CARA | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
PCA ACQUISITIONS V LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs BRANDELL, CARA | |||||||||
CVE1800177 | FERRIS, BRIANNA | 1/30/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs FERRIS, BRIANNA | |||||||||
CVE1800164 | MOOREFIELD, RONALD LEE | 1/29/2018 | |||||||
MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE CO vs MOOREFIELD, RONALD LEE | |||||||||
CVG1800165 | HAYSLETT, CALEB | 1/29/2018 | |||||||
GREAT DAY MGMT OF OHIO LLC AGENT FOR: CHARLENE M COOPER vs HAYSLETT, CALEB | |||||||||
CVE1800166 | REIN, RONALD | 1/29/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs REIN, RONALD | |||||||||
CVF1800167 | SPURLING, DAVID | 1/29/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs SPURLING, DAVID | |||||||||
CVF1800168 | HALL, COURTNEY L | 1/29/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs HALL, COURTNEY L | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 707, 708, 709 ... 1237, 1238, 1239 Next |