24763 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1800465 | JONES, DAVID | 3/23/2018 | |||||||
RICHMOND, JEFFERY vs JONES, DAVID | |||||||||
CVG1800451 | ESTREMERA, JOSE | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
SMITH, STEVEN vs ESTREMERA, JOSE | |||||||||
CVG1800452 | ADAMSON, SHALEKA | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS vs ADAMSON, SHALEKA | |||||||||
CVF1800453 | DERRINGER, ANDREW G. | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs DERRINGER, ANDREW G. | |||||||||
CVF1800454 | SPIKER, MATTHEW | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs SPIKER, MATTHEW | |||||||||
CVF1800455 | MORROW, SHATON | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs MORROW, SHATON | |||||||||
CVI1800456 | THOMPSON, KATELYN | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
EPPERLY, RYAN vs THOMPSON, KATELYN | |||||||||
CVG1800449 | CITY OF VICTORY DELIVERANCE CHURCH C/O WILLIAM LAS... | 3/21/2018 | |||||||
FIELDS, JOHNNY vs CITY OF VICTORY DELIVERANCE CHURCH C/O WILLIAM LAS... | |||||||||
CVG1800450 | KAYLOR, KEITH | 3/21/2018 | |||||||
RIVERA, CIRO vs KAYLOR, KEITH | |||||||||
CVG1800448 | JACKSON, TERRANCE A | 3/21/2018 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY vs JACKSON, TERRANCE A | |||||||||
CVI1800447 | BROWN, SHELIA | 3/21/2018 | |||||||
CURTIS-BURKE, MARCIA vs BROWN, SHELIA | |||||||||
CVG1800446 | STEWART, BRANDON | 3/21/2018 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD DBA STILLWATER PARK APTS vs STEWART, BRANDON | |||||||||
CVI1800444 | GREEN, GELISA RENEE | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
COX RICHARDSON, CYNTHIA vs GREEN, GELISA RENEE | |||||||||
CVG1800445 | MCMAHAN, SHAWN S. | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
DAVIS, SONDRA vs MCMAHAN, SHAWN S. | |||||||||
CVF1800431 | PYLES, DENNIS | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PYLES, DENNIS | |||||||||
CVF1800432 | IVY, KERRY | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs IVY, KERRY | |||||||||
CVF1800433 | CHAPMAN, CHERYL A. | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs CHAPMAN, CHERYL A. | |||||||||
CVE1800434 | JARVIS, HERBERT R. | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs JARVIS, HERBERT R. | |||||||||
CVE1800435 | RAY, RUSSELL LEE | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs RAY, RUSSELL LEE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 687, 688, 689 ... 1237, 1238, 1239 Next |