24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1800713 | O'BERRY, ANTOINE | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LTD DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE OF ENGLEWOO vs O'BERRY, ANTOIN... | |||||||||
CVF1800714 | CALLOWAY, KENYADA | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LTD DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE OF ENGLEWOO vs CALLOWAY, KENYADA | |||||||||
CVF1800715 | SETSER, NICOLE | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LTD DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE OF ENGLEWOO vs SETSER, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVH1800716 | PETIT, DON | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
DUNSON, DEANDRE vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVF1800717 | WHITE, TONY JR. | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LTD DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE OF ENGLEWOO vs WHITE, TONY JR. | |||||||||
CVF1800712 | COSSIN, BRADLEY | 5/8/2018 | |||||||
SOUTHEASTERN EMERG PHYS LLC C/O RACHEL J MASON vs COSSIN, BRADLEY | |||||||||
CVG1800695 | HENSLEY, MITCHELL | 5/7/2018 | |||||||
SIMPLY SHARP MANAGEMENT vs HENSLEY, MITCHELL | |||||||||
CVH1800694 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/4/2018 | |||||||
BROWN, WILLIAM vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF1800688 | TURNER, TRISCHELLE D | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
YORKTOWN COLONY APARTMENTS LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC CO LPA vs TURNER, TRISCHELLE D | |||||||||
CVH1800693 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
HARRIS, JERMAINE vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1800692 | MOORE, NICOLE | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
BWB PROPERTIES LLC vs MOORE, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVF1800691 | HOLLEY, SEAN | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs HOLLEY, SEAN | |||||||||
CVF1800690 | PRATER, DELBERT III | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. vs PRATER, DELBERT III | |||||||||
CVF1800689 | BELL, LOLITA B | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs BELL, LOLITA B | |||||||||
CVG1800687 | SHARPE, MALARIE | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. LTD vs SHARPE, MALARIE | |||||||||
CVG1800686 | HARGROVE, CARMISHA | 5/3/2018 | |||||||
GARDEN WOODS APTS. LTD vs HARGROVE, CARMISHA | |||||||||
CVH1800680 | REGISTRAR, BMV | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
ROBERTS, JAMIE vs REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
CVG1800681 | BURNETT, CORNELIUS | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
300-320 FOREST PARK LLC vs BURNETT, CORNELIUS | |||||||||
CVG1800682 | NIXON, MEGHAN | 5/2/2018 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP DBA TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS vs NIXON, MEGHAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 678, 679, 680 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |