Daily Law Journal
13978 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVG1300315 CLAY, TERRY 3/8/2013
GATEWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS,LLC vs CLAY, TERRY
CVF1300313 ALLEN, JACQUELINE 3/8/2013
OKINUS INC. vs ALLEN, JACQUELINE
CVH1300316 RANKIN, MIKE 3/8/2013
DELOACH, NATASHA vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVF1300314 MCINTYRE, ELZIE JR. 3/8/2013
BEAN, LEROY vs MCINTYRE, ELZIE JR.
CVF1300307 MADDEN, GINA 3/7/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs MADDEN, GINA
CVH1300310 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 3/7/2013
BROOMFIELD, ASHLEY RENEE vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1300308 FRANCIS, ALEXIS 3/7/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs FRANCIS, ALEXIS
CVH1300311 RANKIN, MIKE 3/7/2013
KINDELL, KATHRYN G vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVF1300306 ROESSER, STEVEN K. 3/7/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL vs ROESSER, STEVEN K.
CVG1300309 HARRIS, DANNY 3/7/2013
CARRIKER, DAWONNA J vs HARRIS, DANNY
CVG1300305 MANLEY, ROBERT 3/6/2013
FRIEDMAN MANAGEMENT INC. AS RECEIVER FOR vs MANLEY, ROBERT
CVG1300304 RILEY, ANDREA 3/5/2013
DBH ENTERPRISES, INC. vs RILEY, ANDREA
CVF1300302 JIMENEZ, XAVIER 3/4/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC vs JIMENEZ, XAVIER
CVH1300300 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 3/4/2013
HERRING, RALPH D. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1300303 DEAN, JOHN 3/4/2013
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC BUYER OF HSBC BANK NEVADA NA vs DEAN, JOHN
CVH1300301 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 3/4/2013
WARD, LEE F. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1300293 BRANDENBURG, MICHELLE 3/1/2013
RIVER VALLEY CREDIT UNION INC vs BRANDENBURG, MICHELLE
CVF1300294 WILLIAMS, BRADLY 3/1/2013
WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATL BAN vs WILLIAMS, BRADLY
CVF1300292 ECTON, OMNI 3/1/2013
HEATH, JOCELYNN vs ECTON, OMNI

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 666, 667, 668 ... 697, 698, 699  Next