Daily Law Journal
13592 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVH1201974 LEE, KAMILAH 12/7/2012
BAJWA, IQBAL vs LEE, KAMILAH
CVH1201970 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 12/6/2012
JONES, LISA M. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVI1201969 SOMERS, EDWARD 12/6/2012
HUNT, TODD A. vs SOMERS, EDWARD
CVF1201965 HAY, MARGARET 12/5/2012
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs HAY, MARGARET
CVG1201968 EVANS, KENZIE 12/5/2012
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs EVANS, KENZIE
CVH1201963 RANKIN, MIKE 12/5/2012
KELLOGG, JESSICA vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVG1201966 SCROGGINS, SHANIQUA 12/5/2012
TOWNE PROPERTIES vs SCROGGINS, SHANIQUA
CVF1201964 MORTIZ, CHRISTOPHER 12/5/2012
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MORTIZ, CHRISTOPHER
CVI1201967 MAGNUM AUTO SALES, INC. 12/5/2012
HUNT, BILLY E. vs MAGNUM AUTO SALES, INC.
CVF1201958 ATTENWEILER, BETTY J. 12/4/2012
KORRECT PLUMBING CO., INC. vs ATTENWEILER, BETTY J.
CVF1201961 POSMA, DAVID A. JR. 12/4/2012
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs POSMA, DAVID A. JR.
CVF1201956 CLEMANS, LISA 12/4/2012
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs CLEMANS, LISA
CVG1201959 KEITH, MARY 12/4/2012
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs KEITH, MARY
CVH1201962 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 12/4/2012
HOWARD, CHRISTOPHER vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1201957 AKERS, THOMAS P. 12/4/2012
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs AKERS, THOMAS P.
CVF1201960 LEIS, CHRISTOPHER D. 12/4/2012
BALTES COMMERCIAL REALTY DBA BROWN SCHOOL STATION APTS vs LEIS, CHRISTOPHER D.
CVI1201945 FREEDEN FOR LIFE 12/3/2012
RADFORD, TONYA vs FREEDEN FOR LIFE
CVH1201946 RANKIN, MIKE 12/3/2012
JEVON HILL vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVG1201944 JACKSON, JENNIFER 12/3/2012
JACKSON, DONNA L. vs JACKSON, JENNIFER

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 665, 666, 667 ... 678, 679, 680  Next