Daily Law Journal
14149 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVF1300618 CURTIS, STEVEN 5/9/2013
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4 vs CURTIS, STEVEN
CVG1300611 BAGAMBA, HUSAN G.A. 5/8/2013
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs BAGAMBA, HUSAN G.A.
CVE1300619 HOLIHAN, LEO S. 5/8/2013
ATKINS, SAMUEL S. vs HOLIHAN, LEO S.
CVI1300610 ROSENGARTEN, GREGORY III 5/7/2013
THE DAYTON POWER & LIGHT CO vs ROSENGARTEN, GREGORY III
CVG1300608 SMITH, HAROLD 5/7/2013
R & R INVESTMENTS, INC vs SMITH, HAROLD
CVI1300609 RUSS, DEBRA L 5/7/2013
THOMAS, CHERYL D vs RUSS, DEBRA L
CVG1300607 HOARD, LAMONT 5/7/2013
R & R INVESTMENTS, INC vs HOARD, LAMONT
CVF1300602 BOHSE, KELLY 5/6/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs BOHSE, KELLY
CVG1300605 GOUDY, BRADLEY 5/6/2013
REYNOLDS, R. DOUGLAS vs GOUDY, BRADLEY
CVG1300600 BROWN, TOMIKO 5/6/2013
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs BROWN, TOMIKO
CVF1300603 BOWSER, FAITH 5/6/2013
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK vs BOWSER, FAITH
CVF1300606 HILDRETH, JAMES 5/6/2013
FOUNTAIN SKIN CARE vs HILDRETH, JAMES
CVG1300601 MCCLURE, TAUNYA 5/6/2013
BROWN SCHOOL STATION APTS. vs MCCLURE, TAUNYA
CVH1300604 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 5/6/2013
OAKS, JAIME M. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1300596 STRONG, JAMES S. JR. 5/3/2013
STELLAR RECOVERY, INC. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs STRONG, JAMES S. JR.
CVG1300599 IVY, CASSIUS 5/3/2013
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs IVY, CASSIUS
CVF1300597 MENKE, CHRISTOPHER 5/3/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC ASSIGNEE OF vs MENKE, CHRISTOPHER
CVF1300595 CALVERT, JAMES A. 5/3/2013
MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs CALVERT, JAMES A.
CVF1300598 DAPICE, LESLIE R. 5/3/2013
MOTORISTS MUTUAL INS. CO. AS SUBROGEE OF DADE INC ETAL vs DAPICE, LESLIE R.

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 664, 665, 666 ... 706, 707, 708  Next