24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1801291 | COX, JOSEPH | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs COX, JOSEPH | |||||||||
CVF1801292 | WASHINGTON, MICHAEL | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs WASHINGTON, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVF1801293 | LEWIS, JENNIFER R | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC vs LEWIS, JENNIFER R | |||||||||
CVG1801294 | BROWN, BROCK | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
P.A.G. HOLDINGS LTD vs BROWN, BROCK | |||||||||
CVG1801295 | LEMOYNE, NICOLE | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
PRINCETON MGMT AGENT FOR BROOKVIEW PLACE OWNER LLC vs LEMOYNE, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVG1801296 | CHARLTON, BRANDI | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
MELSON, CONSTANCE E vs CHARLTON, BRANDI | |||||||||
CVG1801297 | THOMAS, KEISHA | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
OBERER MGMT SERVICES/ OBERER DEVELOPMENT CO vs THOMAS, KEISHA | |||||||||
CVF1801290 | ESLICK, CHANEL | 8/14/2018 | |||||||
N.A.R, INC. C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO LPA vs ESLICK, CHANEL | |||||||||
CVG1801284 | ULLERY, LINDA | 8/13/2018 | |||||||
GIBSON, RAY vs ULLERY, LINDA | |||||||||
CVH1801283 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 8/10/2018 | |||||||
MCMAHON, ALAN vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVI1801282 | BUCKEYE HARLEY DAVIDSON | 8/10/2018 | |||||||
WILSON, BRADLEY vs BUCKEYE HARLEY DAVIDSON | |||||||||
CVE1801280 | MESA SPECIALTY INS CO | 8/9/2018 | |||||||
SUPERIOR QUALITY CO INC vs MESA SPECIALTY INS CO | |||||||||
CVF1801281 | WELLS, GARY | 8/9/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WELLS, GARY | |||||||||
CVG1801271 | FORD, KEANDRAE | 8/8/2018 | |||||||
KINGSLEY LTD DBA STILLWATER PARK APARTMENTS vs FORD, KEANDRAE | |||||||||
CVG1801272 | GOOCH, DENISE | 8/8/2018 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs GOOCH, DENISE | |||||||||
CVG1801273 | EDWARDS, DAVID | 8/8/2018 | |||||||
CARTER, KENNETH vs EDWARDS, DAVID | |||||||||
CVG1801274 | HAWKINS, SHADAVA | 8/8/2018 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs HAWKINS, SHADAVA | |||||||||
CVG1801275 | JOINER, SHELDON | 8/8/2018 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs JOINER, SHELDON | |||||||||
CVG1801276 | BROWN, LAKEYSHA | 8/8/2018 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs BROWN, LAKEYSHA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 644, 645, 646 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |