Daily Law Journal
13381 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVH1301188 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 9/4/2013
ARNETT, JON vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVG1301189 BACK, STEPHANIE 9/4/2013
GREMLING, CHRIS vs BACK, STEPHANIE
CVG1301179 WHITE, BEATRICE 9/3/2013
WILSON, BARTON L. vs WHITE, BEATRICE
CVF1301182 EATON, ELIZABETH 9/3/2013
CACH, LLC vs EATON, ELIZABETH
CVG1301180 DYKES, RUTH N. 9/3/2013
WILSON, BARTON L. vs DYKES, RUTH N.
CVI1301183 ADAMS, DENNIS 9/3/2013
PHILLIPS, MEGAN A vs ADAMS, DENNIS
CVF1301181 BERGER, JASON 9/3/2013
ABBEY CREDIT UNION, INC. vs BERGER, JASON
CVF1301184 LAMBDIN, ANNETTE 9/3/2013
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LAMBDIN, ANNETTE
CVF1301176 SUMMERS, JENNIFER 8/30/2013
CYPRESS FINANCIAL vs SUMMERS, JENNIFER
CVG1301177 HAIRSTON, DERRICK 8/30/2013
RICHMOND, JEFFERY G. vs HAIRSTON, DERRICK
CVI1301178 MESSER, KANDISS 8/30/2013
NEY, BARBARA A vs MESSER, KANDISS
CVI1301172 KYLE, RAYMOND 8/29/2013
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KYLE, RAYMOND
CVF1301175 STAMPER, STEPHANIE 8/29/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs STAMPER, STEPHANIE
CVI1301173 BAKER, SHANNON 8/29/2013
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC vs BAKER, SHANNON
CVF1301174 ECKLEY, LAUREN M. 8/29/2013
WRIGHT STATE UNIVERSITY C/O STATE OF OHIO vs ECKLEY, LAUREN M.
CVF1301153 HUELSMAN, MARY 8/28/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs HUELSMAN, MARY
CVH1301151 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 8/28/2013
REYNOLDS, DAVINA J. vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1301154 SMITH, ROBERT 8/28/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs SMITH, ROBERT
CVH1301152 RANKIN, MIKE 8/28/2013
BACH, MATHICLA vs RANKIN, MIKE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 588, 589, 590 ... 668, 669, 670  Next