Daily Law Journal
12167 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVG1300088 COMBS, MISTY 1/18/2013
SCHINDLER, THOMAS vs COMBS, MISTY
CVF1300082 WHITE, JOANECE 1/17/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WHITE, JOANECE
CVH1300083 RANKIN, MIKE 1/17/2013
STARK, LAVAN vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVG1300084 BARBER, ANTHONY 1/17/2013
FREEDOM FOR LIFE INVESTMENTS vs BARBER, ANTHONY
CVG1300076 BURNS, BRADLEY 1/16/2013
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs BURNS, BRADLEY
CVF1300079 SAALMAN, TARA 1/16/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs SAALMAN, TARA
CVG1300077 FOX, BETH 1/16/2013
VILLAS OF ENGLEWOOD, LLC vs FOX, BETH
CVH1300080 RANKIN, MIKE 1/16/2013
DIXON, ALEXCIA vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVG1300078 BASS, GARRETTA 1/16/2013
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs BASS, GARRETTA
CVG1300081 NORMAN, THOMAS JR. 1/16/2013
PHILLIPS VANDALIA, LLC vs NORMAN, THOMAS JR.
CVF1300074 ABDELSAYED, MINA 1/15/2013
BRAY, MARY ANN vs ABDELSAYED, MINA
CVG1300071 BONKOWSKI, MICHAEL 1/14/2013
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs BONKOWSKI, MICHAEL
CVF1300075 MCGILL, LESLIE 1/14/2013
METROPOLITAN BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS, INC. vs MCGILL, LESLIE
CVH1300069 RANKIN, MIKE 1/14/2013
DISHMAN, PRENTIS vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVI1300072 U S BANK PRIVATE CLIENT GROUP 1/14/2013
WELLS, ALEXYS vs U S BANK PRIVATE CLIENT GROUP
CVH1300070 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 1/14/2013
EHRHART, ANGELA vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVG1300073 DAVIDSON, DONTE L. 1/14/2013
SLATON, BRUCE M. II vs DAVIDSON, DONTE L.
CVF1300065 MARTIN, LINDSEY M. 1/11/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs MARTIN, LINDSEY M.
CVG1300063 DISALVO, ANTHONY 1/11/2013
SUBLETTE, WARREN J. vs DISALVO, ANTHONY

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 580, 581, 582 ... 607, 608, 609  Next