Daily Law Journal
11647 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVF1201536 THOMPSON, MICHAEL B. 9/17/2012
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs THOMPSON, MICHAEL B.
CVG1201539 WILSON, SHERIDAN 9/17/2012
MUELLER, RALPH G. vs WILSON, SHERIDAN
CVF1201534 LIRTZMAN, KATHERINE A. 9/17/2012
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs LIRTZMAN, KATHERINE A.
CVF1201537 WEST, RYAN G. 9/17/2012
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs WEST, RYAN G.
CVF1201535 MANTLE, TONY W. 9/17/2012
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs MANTLE, TONY W.
CVG1201538 HENNON, STORMY 9/17/2012
KASTLE, TODD A. vs HENNON, STORMY
CVI1201519 DOBBINS, JONATHAN 9/14/2012
DDK FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA UNITED CHECK CASHING vs DOBBINS, JONATHAN
CVF1201522 RAMONT, KHAMLA 9/14/2012
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs RAMONT, KHAMLA
CVG1201517 BOWLING, BRITTANY 9/14/2012
RNL PROPERTY MGMT., LLC DBA PARKVILLE APARTMENTS vs BOWLING, BRITTANY
CVF1201520 CERIALE, PHILLIP 9/14/2012
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs CERIALE, PHILLIP
CVG1201523 MOSELEY, NATALIE 9/14/2012
JONES, ROBERT A vs MOSELEY, NATALIE
CVG1201518 GREENE, ROBERT T. 9/14/2012
SOURLIS, LETA vs GREENE, ROBERT T.
CVF1201521 METCALFE, NAOMI 9/14/2012
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH vs METCALFE, NAOMI
CVG1201524 SACCO, VERONICA 9/14/2012
NANCY PINARD, LTD vs SACCO, VERONICA
CVF1201516 JOSLIN, KEITH 9/13/2012
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JOSLIN, KEITH
CVG1201514 LEAVELLE, MISTY 9/12/2012
WASHINGTON, JEFF vs LEAVELLE, MISTY
CVG1201515 HOLMES, BRIAN 9/12/2012
KINGSLEY LTD DBA STILLWATER PARK APARTMENTS vs HOLMES, BRIAN
CVF1201510 SHARP, RITA M. 9/11/2012
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs SHARP, RITA M.
CVF1201511 WELLS, PATRICIA 9/11/2012
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs WELLS, PATRICIA

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 579, 580, 581, 582, 583  Next