Daily Law Journal
13195 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVG1301201 WALTERS, JENNIFER 9/9/2013
B&L ENTERPRISES vs WALTERS, JENNIFER
CVG1301196 COMBS, CARLOS 9/9/2013
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs COMBS, CARLOS
CVG1301199 WYNN, LOUIS 9/9/2013
KINGSLEY LTD vs WYNN, LOUIS
CVG1301202 DAVIS, BRITTANY 9/9/2013
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES vs DAVIS, BRITTANY
CVG1301197 IVY, CASSIUS 9/9/2013
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs IVY, CASSIUS
CVG1301200 BROWN, GWENDOLYN 9/9/2013
KINGSLEY LTD vs BROWN, GWENDOLYN
CVG1301195 HARRIS, TONY 9/9/2013
5610 NORTH MAIN, LLC vs HARRIS, TONY
CVG1301198 NEWMAN, MONA 9/9/2013
GARDEN WOODS APTS. vs NEWMAN, MONA
CVH1301192 PEEP ZEE REALITY 9/6/2013
SIMMONS, TERRY vs PEEP ZEE REALITY
CVG1301191 DAVIS, JACQUELINE 9/6/2013
RSB INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA RSBI ENTERPRISES vs DAVIS, JACQUELINE
CVG1301190 ELLIOTT, ROBERT 9/5/2013
HEINDL, LARRY vs ELLIOTT, ROBERT
CVF1301186 EDWARDS, ALEXANDER 9/4/2013
BAILEY, KALESHA vs EDWARDS, ALEXANDER
CVG1301189 BACK, STEPHANIE 9/4/2013
GREMLING, CHRIS vs BACK, STEPHANIE
CVG1301187 NAPIER, FRANCIS JAMES 9/4/2013
BOGGESS, LARRY vs NAPIER, FRANCIS JAMES
CVG1301185 SURBAUGH, DAVID 9/4/2013
COUNTY CORP. INC. vs SURBAUGH, DAVID
CVH1301188 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 9/4/2013
ARNETT, JON vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1301181 BERGER, JASON 9/3/2013
ABBEY CREDIT UNION, INC. vs BERGER, JASON
CVG1301179 WHITE, BEATRICE 9/3/2013
WILSON, BARTON L. vs WHITE, BEATRICE
CVF1301182 EATON, ELIZABETH 9/3/2013
CACH, LLC vs EATON, ELIZABETH

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 578, 579, 580 ... 658, 659, 660  Next