19197 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST00012 | THE ESTATE OF MICHELE ROSS | 1/5/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02235 | THE ESTATE OF MAXINE DUFFY | 1/4/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02236 | THE ESTATE OF ALVINA MICHAEL | 1/4/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02230 | THE ESTATE OF FREDERICK GILBERT | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02231 | THE ESTATE OF MATTHEW CORLEY | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02225 | THE ESTATE OF KATHERINE QUIGLEY | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02232 | THE ESTATE OF RILEY KIRSCH | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02205 | THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH HONAKER | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00007 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD PANNELL | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02221 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIE KAZEE | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02136 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY BITTMANN | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02227 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM DANIEL | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02226 | THE ESTATE OF NOVA CHILDRESS | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00958 | THE ESTATE OF DEANN GAU | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02218 | THE ESTATE OF JANET BARNARD | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02128 | THE ESTATE OF MERLE CARR | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST01621 | THE ESTATE OF RAUL TAYLOR | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02196 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT KNOTT | 12/29/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02198 | THE ESTATE OF SIDNEY HAGAN | 12/29/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 449, 450, 451 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |