19197 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST00432 | THE ESTATE OF BERNICE COMBS | 3/15/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00431 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD ADAMS | 3/15/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00433 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT COLLINSWORTH | 3/15/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00451 | THE ESTATE OF GUSTER WHITE JR. | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST01678 | THE ESTATE OF GENE FELTY | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00411 | THE ESTATE OF REBECCA O'CONNOR | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00449 | THE ESTATE OF WILMA PETREQUIN | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00445 | THE ESTATE OF JENNIFER BARR | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00444 | THE ESTATE OF DONNA TRUEX | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00429 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT KELLEY | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00427 | THE ESTATE OF MARY GLAVIN | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00424 | THE ESTATE OF RUTH STEMMLER | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00420 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN GREELY | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00414 | THE ESTATE OF MAKYLA WHITE | 3/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00446 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT DURNING | 3/13/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00435 | THE ESTATE OF RUBY WHITE | 3/13/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST01446 | THE ESTATE OF SUE GEDRA | 3/9/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00380 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN CLENDENING | 3/9/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST00388 | THE ESTATE OF JULIE BOWERS | 3/8/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 432, 433, 434 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |