19191 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST01130 | THE ESTATE OF JANET HOLDER | 6/23/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01090 | THE ESTATE OF THELMA CLARK | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01097 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY VANCE | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01103 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL SCROGGY | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE WILL ONLY | |||||||||
2017EST01105 | THE ESTATE OF WALTER CHERWINSKI | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01037 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD GROSS | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01099 | THE ESTATE OF MARY HOSMER | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01096 | THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINE GUY | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01102 | THE ESTATE OF KLARA HOLDERMAN | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01133 | THE ESTATE OF ILENE PLUMMER | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01089 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD COTTERMAN | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01114 | THE ESTATE OF ANNE OWEN | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01091 | THE ESTATE OF MARY LEAR | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01077 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY BUERK | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01078 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY PURCELL | 6/20/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01088 | THE ESTATE OF JONATHAN COLWELL | 6/20/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01092 | THE ESTATE OF MARILOUISE FORBRIGER | 6/20/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01061 | THE ESTATE OF JUSTICE PERGRAM | 6/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01079 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT COATES | 6/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 403, 404, 405 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |