19209 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST01197 | THE ESTATE OF MARY JONES | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01189 | THE ESTATE OF JANET SHEETS | 7/7/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01198 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES BURTON | 7/7/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST02228 | THE ESTATE OF DIANE YOST | 7/7/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01207 | THE ESTATE OF DARREN PLUMMER | 7/7/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01165 | THE ESTATE OF VINCENT LAURICELLA | 7/6/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
1975EST210218 | THE ESTATE OF ELLIS JOHNSON | 7/6/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01188 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS RODERER | 7/6/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01186 | THE ESTATE OF CLARENCE GABBARD | 7/6/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01182 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM LOVELL | 7/6/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01179 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS TIERNAN | 7/6/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01177 | THE ESTATE OF MARY GREGGERSON | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01181 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES MCCARROLL | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01176 | THE ESTATE OF MARJORIE MACY | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01117 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL SATTERFIELD | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01171 | THE ESTATE OF HENRY HOLT | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01167 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA BARNES | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01172 | THE ESTATE OF MARJORIE BIDDLESTONE | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01162 | THE ESTATE OF LOIS MCGOWAN | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 400, 401, 402 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |