19213 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00436 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN MILLER JR | 3/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00231 | THE ESTATE OF ALBERTA WARFORD | 3/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00461 | THE ESTATE OF ANNIE HARRIS | 3/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00186 | THE ESTATE OF GERALDINE WELCH-HATT | 3/7/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00182 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL MCMANNIS | 3/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00332 | THE ESTATE OF BATON EMINI | 3/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00404 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID WEBSTER | 3/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00225 | THE ESTATE OF LUE COOPER | 3/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00415 | THE ESTATE OF THALIA BROWN | 3/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00463 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES BRAY | 3/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00435 | THE ESTATE OF JULIE JENKINS | 2/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00383 | THE ESTATE OF KELVIN CLEMENTS | 2/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00139 | THE ESTATE OF SYLVIA TRITCH | 2/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00410 | THE ESTATE OF MAXINE HATFIELD | 2/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00334 | THE ESTATE OF KEVIN YOUNG | 2/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00392 | THE ESTATE OF FAYE WHITE | 2/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00314 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD WALKER | 2/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01804 | THE ESTATE OF RAY JEFFERS JR | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02196 | THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR ROSENFELDER JR. | 2/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |