19213 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST01225 | THE ESTATE OF JACK THORNE | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01221 | THE ESTATE OF WANDA HANE | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01231 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE ATKINS | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01224 | THE ESTATE OF EDWARD BECK | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00982 | THE ESTATE OF MICHELLE JEFFERSON | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2016EST01481 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT DRESHER | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01202 | THE ESTATE OF DONNA MARTINDALE | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01048 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS HARTING | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01116 | THE ESTATE OF MARY CLEAVER | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01215 | THE ESTATE OF DOLLIE FISCHER-BURTON | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01214 | THE ESTATE OF IRMA ALLEN | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01206 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID SCHULTZ | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION | |||||||||
2017EST01200 | THE ESTATE OF WANDA KNOOP | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01203 | THE ESTATE OF JUANITA BRISON | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01205 | THE ESTATE OF MARJORIE HAUENSTEIN | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01201 | THE ESTATE OF REGINA CLAY | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01208 | THE ESTATE OF MARILYN FRYE | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01212 | THE ESTATE OF WILMA BENNETT | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01174 | THE ESTATE OF REGINA FORD | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 399, 400, 401 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |