19197 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST01641 | THE ESTATE OF DOLORES MADDEN | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01643 | THE ESTATE OF SCOTT GROVES | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01887 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA ALMY | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01630 | THE ESTATE OF SHEILA STONE-WILLIAMS | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01638 | THE ESTATE OF MARGARET EDWARDS | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01623 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIE GRIFFIN | 9/18/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01601 | THE ESTATE OF LOIS LOWE | 9/15/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01619 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM THOMPSON | 9/15/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01613 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS RUPERT | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01627 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM MARTIN | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01622 | THE ESTATE OF KAREN MAHRT | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01614 | THE ESTATE OF LOUISE EPPERSON | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01628 | THE ESTATE OF APRYL WILLS | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01061 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT BEGLEY | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01610 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICK DAVIS | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01607 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD FLORA | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01561 | THE ESTATE OF DORIS BLUM | 9/13/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01587 | THE ESTATE OF VICTOR HINES | 9/13/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01585 | THE ESTATE OF GARY ANDREWS | 9/13/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 382, 383, 384 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |