19190 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017EST02225 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL RAU | 1/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02241 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL TRITTSCHUH | 1/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02243 | THE ESTATE OF ESTHER LEWIS | 1/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00002 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD WENDELN | 1/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02221 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT SCHERBAUER JR. | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02212 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL PIERCE | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01752 | THE ESTATE OF JUANITA BIVENS | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02168 | THE ESTATE OF SHARON WALKER | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02215 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID WAGGONER | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02220 | THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND LINK, JR | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02231 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD WENCLEWICZ | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02191 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD DAPORE | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
EST: OTHER | |||||||||
2015EST02331 | THE ESTATE OF ROY DILLON | 12/27/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2017EST02206 | THE ESTATE OF TODD SCHWAB | 12/26/2017 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 355, 356, 357 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |