19190 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018EST00450 | THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY RUCKER | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00386 | THE ESTATE OF FRANK BUCK | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018TRS00002 | THE TRUSTEESHIP OF ALICE PENN | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
TRS: TESTATE TRUST | |||||||||
2018EST00465 | THE ESTATE OF EDWARD VERT | 3/12/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00453 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD RIDENOUR | 3/12/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00430 | THE ESTATE OF BILLIE GRIFFITH | 3/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00451 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD FENNER | 3/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00440 | THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND RODGERS | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2012EST01696 | THE ESTATE OF BLANCHE ADAM | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00435 | THE ESTATE OF GERALDINE FECKE | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00433 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH KEMPER | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00446 | THE ESTATE OF MAUDIE FOLEY | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00439 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID ROBINSON | 3/7/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00407 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM ST. CLAIR | 3/7/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00423 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA HENSLEY-WARD | 3/7/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00444 | THE ESTATE OF JACOB SCHWARTZ SR. | 3/7/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00425 | THE ESTATE OF MILDRED CHAFFIN | 3/7/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00365 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN HINSHAW | 3/7/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00400 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN CIMPRICH | 3/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 334, 335, 336 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |