19161 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018EST00471 | THE ESTATE OF RAYMOND FRYE, JR. | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00481 | THE ESTATE OF JANE DAWSON | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00378 | THE ESTATE OF KEVIN REID | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00449 | THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA MARTIN | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00454 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GOETZ | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00461 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD CARR | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00478 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY MANSEL | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00456 | THE ESTATE OF JOY LITTEN | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00106 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID KATZ | 3/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00462 | THE ESTATE OF ANGIE LYONS | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00386 | THE ESTATE OF FRANK BUCK | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00450 | THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY RUCKER | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018TRS00002 | THE TRUSTEESHIP OF ALICE PENN | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
TRS: TESTATE TRUST | |||||||||
2018EST00469 | THE ESTATE OF MAURICE KIRKWOOD | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00465 | THE ESTATE OF EDWARD VERT | 3/12/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00453 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD RIDENOUR | 3/12/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00430 | THE ESTATE OF BILLIE GRIFFITH | 3/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00451 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD FENNER | 3/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00446 | THE ESTATE OF MAUDIE FOLEY | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 332, 333, 334 ... 957, 958, 959 Next |