19197 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018EST00652 | THE ESTATE OF MARILYN STEWART | 4/4/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00602 | THE ESTATE OF WAYNE KESLING | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00603 | THE ESTATE OF RUTH RUFENER | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00604 | THE ESTATE OF LILLET HAMILTON | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00616 | THE ESTATE OF JOYCE FORSYTHE | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00624 | THE ESTATE OF NURIEL GUTHEIL | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00626 | THE ESTATE OF ALICE BROIDA | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00634 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL BAER | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00639 | THE ESTATE OF FRANCES MCCOMAS | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00545 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN TEISTER | 4/3/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00613 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM GOOD | 4/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00605 | THE ESTATE OF JEAN GAD | 4/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00628 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA GOLSON | 4/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00625 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD FISHER | 4/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00615 | THE ESTATE OF SUSAN GREENE | 4/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00593 | THE ESTATE OF VIVIAN MOSER | 3/29/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00584 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL MORRIS | 3/28/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00576 | THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY BROWN | 3/28/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00589 | THE ESTATE OF DENNIS JONES | 3/28/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 329, 330, 331 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |