19209 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018EST01170 | THE ESTATE OF MARSHALL KING | 6/15/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01169 | THE ESTATE OF HELENA BLACKBURN | 6/15/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01101 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM DARLING | 6/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01152 | THE ESTATE OF DENNIS WOODS | 6/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01155 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH CLARK | 6/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01159 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS SMITH | 6/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01165 | THE ESTATE OF MARY ATKINSON | 6/14/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01136 | THE ESTATE OF VADA SHOEMAKER | 6/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01158 | THE ESTATE OF OPAL LEO | 6/13/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01142 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY CLERE | 6/12/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01153 | THE ESTATE OF YVONNE ANTICOLI | 6/12/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01105 | THE ESTATE OF BRIAN CRUM | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01132 | THE ESTATE OF MITCHELL SIMMONS | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01135 | THE ESTATE OF DIANN DAWSON | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01140 | THE ESTATE OF ROSE KABEL | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01141 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD KABEL | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADMIN; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01143 | THE ESTATE OF THEDA BURCHETT | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01148 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN HINSHAW | 6/11/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01120 | THE ESTATE OF DOUGLAS PENNEY | 6/8/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 311, 312, 313 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |