19194 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018EST01332 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN CALDERON, III | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: OTHER | |||||||||
2018EST01314 | THE ESTATE OF STANLEY ESTES | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01294 | THE ESTATE OF LUCILLE WAPPLES | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01299 | THE ESTATE OF MARY CARNES | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01301 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN LAFLAME | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01231 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLE FROMMEYER | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01305 | THE ESTATE OF JUDY PRESTON | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01270 | THE ESTATE OF LORRAINE LAWSON | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01287 | THE ESTATE OF BOBBY GILLON | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01285 | THE ESTATE OF TERRY GUNTHER | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01280 | THE ESTATE OF TERRY GAULT | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01279 | THE ESTATE OF MARGUERITE DAHER | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01278 | THE ESTATE OF SANDRA KUZMA | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01277 | THE ESTATE OF JOYCE MCGOWAN | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01269 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN RATLIFF SR. | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01268 | THE ESTATE OF ALONZO MOORE | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01242 | THE ESTATE OF E. MOORE | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01220 | THE ESTATE OF HAROLD BOWENS | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01163 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY SALYERS | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 306, 307, 308 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |