19161 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018EST01300 | THE ESTATE OF LISA BROWN | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01313 | THE ESTATE OF R. REAGAN | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01316 | THE ESTATE OF WARREN PATTON | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01317 | THE ESTATE OF JEWELL KEY | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01318 | THE ESTATE OF LINDA MORRIS | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01323 | THE ESTATE OF DON COWELL | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01230 | THE ESTATE OF MARCUS HALCOMB | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01314 | THE ESTATE OF STANLEY ESTES | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01332 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN CALDERON, III | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
EST: OTHER | |||||||||
2018EST01299 | THE ESTATE OF MARY CARNES | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01301 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN LAFLAME | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01294 | THE ESTATE OF LUCILLE WAPPLES | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01231 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLE FROMMEYER | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01305 | THE ESTATE OF JUDY PRESTON | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01242 | THE ESTATE OF E. MOORE | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01268 | THE ESTATE OF ALONZO MOORE | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01269 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN RATLIFF SR. | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01270 | THE ESTATE OF LORRAINE LAWSON | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01277 | THE ESTATE OF JOYCE MCGOWAN | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 304, 305, 306 ... 957, 958, 959 Next |