19196 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019EST00010 | THE ESTATE OF KAREN THOMSON | 1/3/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02308 | THE ESTATE OF BRUSH METCALF, JR | 1/3/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02380 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH DUNFORD, JR. | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02374 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY HENDERSON | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02375 | THE ESTATE OF GRACE CROUCH | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02344 | THE ESTATE OF NANCY PATTERSON | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00004 | THE ESTATE OF CECELIA GORMAN | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02369 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD STEIN | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01964 | THE ESTATE OF DONNA JACKSON | 1/2/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00002 | THE ESTATE OF INGRID DINVALDS | 12/31/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02356 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH PIERCE | 12/31/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02115 | THE ESTATE OF MARGARET COLLINS | 12/28/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02290 | THE ESTATE OF INGEBORG HUTCHINSON | 12/28/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02360 | THE ESTATE OF FRANK IGAH | 12/27/2018 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02299 | THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN DAY | 12/27/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02365 | THE ESTATE OF HAROLD MITCHELL | 12/27/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02363 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH BANGE | 12/27/2018 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 277, 278, 279 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |