19194 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019EST00065 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD KLEIN | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
EST: OTHER | |||||||||
2019EST00062 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY KERN | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00063 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY TUCKER | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00054 | THE ESTATE OF ELMER SLOAN | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00049 | THE ESTATE OF MABEL DOUGLAS | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00047 | THE ESTATE OF FOSTER STONE | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00032 | THE ESTATE OF KATHARINA HARGOT | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00050 | THE ESTATE OF GARETH KNIGHT | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02252 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES LOGEL | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00033 | THE ESTATE OF MICHELLE MINOUGHAN | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00035 | THE ESTATE OF IRENE CLONCE | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01976 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN LANTIS | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00023 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA BIGA | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00037 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT SIMS | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2018EST00199 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD KIDDLE | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02100 | THE ESTATE OF JACK MOYER | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02367 | THE ESTATE OF SALLY GILBERT | 1/8/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST02359 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES JOHNSON | 1/8/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02348 | THE ESTATE OF KATHY LONG | 1/8/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 275, 276, 277 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |