19209 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019EST00142 | THE ESTATE OF MILDRED DILLON | 2/4/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00141 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES KEY | 2/4/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00096 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA GOUBEAUX | 2/1/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00176 | THE ESTATE OF BEVERLY BROWN | 2/1/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00165 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL MORRIN | 2/1/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00147 | THE ESTATE OF ROSEMARY GRIFFITH | 2/1/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2018EST01767 | THE ESTATE OF MARY BUCKNER | 1/31/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00172 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL BLAIR | 1/31/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00136 | THE ESTATE OF HOWARD SIMS | 1/31/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00160 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD JENKINS, SR | 1/31/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00170 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL CASEY | 1/31/2019 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00057 | THE ESTATE OF MARIE BOLDEN | 1/30/2019 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00145 | THE ESTATE OF CECILE CARY | 1/30/2019 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00152 | THE ESTATE OF PANELIN WORLEY | 1/30/2019 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2017EST01317 | THE ESTATE OF CHERYL GREENE | 1/30/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00149 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS BALDASARE | 1/29/2019 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00148 | THE ESTATE OF RALPH WATSON | 1/29/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00120 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID WILSON | 1/29/2019 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2019EST00103 | THE ESTATE OF MARY WOLAVER | 1/29/2019 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 271, 272, 273 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |