19197 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00620 | THE ESTATE OF VICKIE HUDSON | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00499 | THE ESTATE OF JERALD MCCONNEL | 4/5/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00654 | THE ESTATE OF BRANDON TASTE | 4/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00625 | THE ESTATE OF JUDY STRAHL | 4/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00650 | THE ESTATE OF ANITA DAVIS | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00662 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS VINSON | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00192 | THE ESTATE OF RUTH WILLIAMSON | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00558 | THE ESTATE OF DOUGLAS WASSON | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02594 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN GRAY | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00615 | THE ESTATE OF KAREN TOMLIN | 3/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00578 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE CARROLL | 3/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00599 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL BRANDENBURG JR | 3/29/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00589 | THE ESTATE OF KEITH DAVIS | 3/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00598 | THE ESTATE OF ALBERT GRIFFIN | 3/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST02561 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN CRABTREE | 3/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00617 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES NIESS | 3/27/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00594 | THE ESTATE OF JANE HALL | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00519 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES LEE WYATT | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00571 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM CARTER | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, ... 958, 959, 960 Next |