19452 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2013EST01835 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS HINES | 10/4/2013 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2013GRD00289 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF BRYANT DRISCOLL | 10/3/2013 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2013GRD00288 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF JAYCE RINDERLE | 10/3/2013 | |||||||
GRD: MINOR INJURY SETTLEMENT NO GUARDIANSHIP | |||||||||
2013EST01988 | THE ESTATE OF MARY WEFLER | 10/2/2013 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01970 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID LEWIS | 10/2/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01969 | THE ESTATE OF DORIS O'DIAM | 10/2/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01978 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN GETER, SR. | 10/2/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013GRD00292 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF AYRINGTON FANCHER | 10/2/2013 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2013EST01971 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH SCHUBERT | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01962 | THE ESTATE OF JOAN TRICK | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01893 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID RICE | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01981 | THE ESTATE OF ALAN THOR | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01974 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS GILLUM | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01973 | THE ESTATE OF LOREN GROSS | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2013EST01960 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN GUEHL | 10/1/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01963 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID CLOUSE | 9/30/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01966 | THE ESTATE OF LEONARD MCKINNEY | 9/30/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01964 | THE ESTATE OF DORTHA ANDERSON | 9/30/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01919 | THE ESTATE OF MC COLE | 9/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 795, 796, 797 ... 971, 972, 973 Next |