19197 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2013EST01839 | THE ESTATE OF NANCY GILLESPIE | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2013GRD00260 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF NATHAN FUSSNECKER | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP MINOR | |||||||||
2012GRD00001 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF ROBERT WATKINS | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2013GRD00261 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF DIONTANAE CLAY | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
GRD: MINOR INJURY SETTLEMENT NO GUARDIANSHIP | |||||||||
2013EST01818 | THE ESTATE OF GRACE FISH | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01823 | THE ESTATE OF W. LOPRESTI | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01831 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN BARNER | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01819 | THE ESTATE OF KELLY CRACE | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01776 | THE ESTATE OF AUSTIN ABSHIRE | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013TRS00015 | THE TRUSTEESHIP OF ELIZABETH FISTE | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
TRS: TESTATE TRUST | |||||||||
2013EST01826 | THE ESTATE OF EVELYN PENNINGTON | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01808 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE RICHARDSON | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST01824 | THE ESTATE OF HARRY HESTER | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY | |||||||||
2013EST01515 | THE ESTATE OF RUSSELL ROACH | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013GRD00255 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF LAUREN GINDRATT | 9/5/2013 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP MINOR | |||||||||
2013EST01812 | THE ESTATE OF IRENE POTASKY | 9/5/2013 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2013EST01791 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA THOMPSON | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2013EST01792 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES LYNN | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013GRD00197 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF GERALDINE MCGARVEY | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
GRD: LIFE ESSENTIALS(CHUMS) ADULT GUARDIANSHIP | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 789, 790, 791 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |