19196 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2013EST02498 | THE ESTATE OF NANCEE COPAS | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02489 | THE ESTATE OF THELMA HOWETT | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02512 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA GUGGENHEIMER | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2013EST01454 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY GARR | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02494 | THE ESTATE OF BRITTANY GEIGER | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2007EST02269 | THE ESTATE OF JULIA HENDRICKS | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADM WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02496 | THE ESTATE OF ROSEMARY CLARK | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013GRD00377 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF CECELIA FREEMAN | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2013EST01919 | THE ESTATE OF MC COLE | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02465 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY MCCREADY | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013GRD00372 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF KEITH BISHOP | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2013EST02470 | THE ESTATE OF TEDD NICHOLAS | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02462 | THE ESTATE OF MIRIAM LAKES | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02482 | THE ESTATE OF GENEVA VANCE | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2010EST02298 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID RICHARDSON | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02476 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID CHUMBLER | 12/27/2013 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02428 | THE ESTATE OF LORA MRUSEK | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013TRS00022 | THE TRUSTEESHIP OF EDGAR HERRMAN | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
TRS: TESTATE TRUST | |||||||||
2013EST02483 | THE ESTATE OF ISIAH PHELPS | 12/26/2013 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 755, 756, 757 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |