19194 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2014EST00070 | THE ESTATE OF ROSYETTA DAVIS | 1/15/2014 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00031 | THE ESTATE OF ORVILLE REED | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02461 | THE ESTATE OF JENNIBEL MILLER | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00051 | THE ESTATE OF HOMER HACKER | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00045 | THE ESTATE OF FLORA PHILLIPS | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02424 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN WEBER | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
EST: ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION | |||||||||
2014GRD00008 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF BRITTANY BEST | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00006 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF JESSE WILLIAMSON | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00011 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF MADISON SPENCER | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP MINOR | |||||||||
2014GRD00010 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF MORGAN SPENCER | 1/14/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP MINOR | |||||||||
2014EST00030 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH VAGEDES | 1/13/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00038 | THE ESTATE OF CARL HENDRIX | 1/13/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00042 | THE ESTATE OF HELEN APPLE | 1/13/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00025 | THE ESTATE OF MYRON POLING | 1/10/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2014EST00026 | THE ESTATE OF FRANK SIGGINS | 1/10/2014 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2014EST00044 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM ALLEN | 1/10/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2014GRD00004 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF ROBERT HAYES JR. | 1/10/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2014EST00039 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ZIMMERMAN | 1/10/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST02179 | THE ESTATE OF NEIL BARRY | 1/9/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 752, 753, 754 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |