19194 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2014EST01385 | THE ESTATE OF DOLORES RICHARDS | 7/31/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01305 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD COLLINS | 7/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01377 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM TAYLOR, SR. | 7/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01378 | THE ESTATE OF VIRGILENE ROLLINGS | 7/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2014EST01386 | THE ESTATE OF EUGENE CASELLA | 7/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2013EST00922 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES PARKS | 7/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01373 | THE ESTATE OF FLORENCE YOUNG | 7/29/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01375 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL SHINE | 7/29/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY | |||||||||
2014GRD00195 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF JULY LEONARD | 7/29/2014 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00197 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF RYAN ADAMS | 7/29/2014 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00194 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF TERRY MOSLEY | 7/29/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00196 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF PEGGY TERRY | 7/28/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00185 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF FLORENCE COLLINS | 7/28/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2014EST01381 | THE ESTATE OF VIRGINIA TALKISH | 7/28/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2014EST01335 | THE ESTATE OF KATHY FRAZIER | 7/25/2014 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01353 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES FINNEY | 7/25/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01358 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL PHILLIPS | 7/25/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01347 | THE ESTATE OF SYBIL TAPP | 7/25/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 687, 688, 689 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |