19191 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2014EST01788 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY MCMAHON | 10/3/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01782 | THE ESTATE OF JUANITA KEENE | 10/3/2014 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2014EST01754 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT OBER JR. | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2014EST01770 | THE ESTATE OF ANNA SPARKS | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY | |||||||||
2014EST01733 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD GUTHRIE | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01781 | THE ESTATE OF LOLLA SCHELCHER | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01784 | THE ESTATE OF HARRY BUSSARD | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01785 | THE ESTATE OF REX BROCKMAN | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01786 | THE ESTATE OF THERESA BOLE | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014TRS00004 | THE TRUSTEESHIP OF MARY LOGAN | 10/2/2014 | |||||||
TRS: TESTATE TRUST | |||||||||
2014EST01799 | THE ESTATE OF RUSSELL LEE, SR. | 10/1/2014 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2014GRD00272 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF JOSEPH PROCTER | 10/1/2014 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2014EST01803 | THE ESTATE OF GWENDOLYN DAVIS | 10/1/2014 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2014EST01792 | THE ESTATE OF STELLA ABRAMS | 9/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014GRD00262 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF ADAM FLOWERS | 9/30/2014 | |||||||
GRD: ADULT GUARDIANSHIP INDIGENT | |||||||||
2014EST01780 | THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR MCNAMARA | 9/30/2014 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2014GRD00267 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF HILDA LACHEY | 9/29/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2014GRD00230 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF MARK BERTIG | 9/29/2014 | |||||||
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT | |||||||||
2014EST01766 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPHINE POLLARD | 9/29/2014 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 666, 667, 668 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |