19216 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015EST00955 | THE ESTATE OF JUNE DUERR | 5/27/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00692 | THE ESTATE OF MARGARET BANKS | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00878 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY WILKUS | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00889 | THE ESTATE OF WILFORD HALL | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00900 | THE ESTATE OF THEODORE EDWARDS | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00895 | THE ESTATE OF FREDERICK ELLIS | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST00851 | THE ESTATE OF LINVLE ROSE | 5/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00858 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS JOHNSTON | 5/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST00852 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL SUROVEC | 5/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00874 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM JACKSON, III | 5/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST00720 | THE ESTATE OF META PIERRON | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00855 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES SCHOENING | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00838 | THE ESTATE OF MELVIN JACKSON, JR. | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2014EST00025 | THE ESTATE OF MYRON POLING | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00758 | THE ESTATE OF RUTH CRIAG | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00841 | THE ESTATE OF JACK GAINES | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00840 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN DAY | 5/11/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00369 | THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA PENLEY | 5/8/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00862 | THE ESTATE OF GLADYS PETTIGEW | 5/8/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 603, 604, 605 ... 959, 960, 961 Next |