19191 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015EST01111 | THE ESTATE OF SUZANNE WARREN | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01118 | THE ESTATE OF PRISCILLA CRAWFORD | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01123 | THE ESTATE OF NOLIA BOWMAN | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01076 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD GIBSON | 6/17/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01093 | THE ESTATE OF PAUL ALLISON | 6/17/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01084 | THE ESTATE OF LILLIAN DAVIDSON | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01086 | THE ESTATE OF GOLDIE LEWIS | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01102 | THE ESTATE OF ANGELA THOMAS | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01089 | THE ESTATE OF YVONNE SINNAMON | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01078 | THE ESTATE OF JOHANNA COLUMBRO | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01075 | THE ESTATE OF HELEN FIG | 6/15/2015 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2015EST01081 | THE ESTATE OF VIRGINIA MILLER | 6/15/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01077 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID DUSAK | 6/15/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01070 | THE ESTATE OF MARK LONGENECKER | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01079 | THE ESTATE OF KATHRYN SPORKA | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00863 | THE ESTATE OF MAMIE COCKRELL | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST00926 | THE ESTATE OF DORLIS GALLOWAY | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01050 | THE ESTATE OF MARY KELLEY | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01058 | THE ESTATE OF JACK ROWLAND | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 596, 597, 598 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |