19196 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015EST01282 | THE ESTATE OF RITA LEININGER | 7/16/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01268 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA HENN | 7/15/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01275 | THE ESTATE OF JANITH PEARSON | 7/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01261 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL HALL | 7/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01267 | THE ESTATE OF VICKIE WILSON | 7/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01274 | THE ESTATE OF KATHLEEN HOWARD | 7/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01240 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM BAUMHAUER | 7/14/2015 | |||||||
EST: ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION | |||||||||
2015EST01255 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM WRIGHT, SR. | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01272 | THE ESTATE OF GREGORY WOODS | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01083 | THE ESTATE OF LILLIAN KERN | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01262 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES PARLETTE | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01254 | THE ESTATE OF YULE BONNER | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2015EST01260 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE HICKS | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01257 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS SMITH | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY | |||||||||
2015EST01250 | THE ESTATE OF JULIAN BONE | 7/13/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01218 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA PRESTON | 7/10/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01243 | THE ESTATE OF CORA MCCLURE | 7/10/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01247 | THE ESTATE OF DAINA WEBB | 7/10/2015 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01270 | THE ESTATE OF RUTH SKELTON | 7/10/2015 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 590, 591, 592 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |