19193 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2015EST00710 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA BOWMAN | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADM WITH WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00012 | THE ESTATE OF MANFRED SCHOEPPER | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00030 | THE ESTATE OF LARRY BOWMAN | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00018 | THE ESTATE OF SAUNDRA STARKS | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00022 | THE ESTATE OF TODD WARNER | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00031 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WELLER | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
2016EST00016 | THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY PIVERAL | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00029 | THE ESTATE OF EVELYN BARNETT | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00027 | THE ESTATE OF BARBARA SEVERSON | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01857 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD ERBAUGH | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00006 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN BACK, SR. | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST02063 | THE ESTATE OF LUCIUS HILL | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2015EST02360 | THE ESTATE OF DORIS CASSLEY | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2010EST00131 | THE ESTATE OF YUNUS YAQEEN | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL SUCCESSOR ADM WITHOUT WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00009 | THE ESTATE OF HUGHETTA CLAY | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2015EST02349 | THE ESTATE OF EILEEN FENTON | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST01805 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE ATKINS | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2015EST02344 | THE ESTATE OF REX BOLINGER | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2016EST00004 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM CROMER | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
EST: PROBATE ONLY & REL OF ADMIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 542, 543, 544 ... 958, 959, 960 Next |