Daily Law Journal
10684 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2013CVF00533 INTERSTATE HEAVY DUTY TRUCK & TRAILER REPAIR, LLC 3/12/2014
ISMAIL ISKANDAROV vs INTERSTATE HEAVY DUTY TRUCK & TRAILER REPAIR, LLC
2012CVF00579 KRISTA A FOX 3/12/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs KRISTA A FOX
2014CVG00170 CHAD FLETCHER, ET AL 3/12/2014
WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APTS vs CHAD FLETCHER, ET AL
2014CVH00128 FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES 3/11/2014
TIMOTHY J ROBERTSON vs FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
2013CVF01008 HATTIE R MORRIS 3/10/2014
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs HATTIE R MORRIS
2014CVI00086 DONALD ROBERTS 3/10/2014
SHOU B ZHANG vs DONALD ROBERTS
2014CVI00097 RYAN MULINS 3/10/2014
JENNIFER JETT vs RYAN MULINS
2014CVH00178 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR BMV 3/10/2014
JEREMY M SIKORA vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR BMV
2014CVG00163 JESSICA MARLOW ET AL 3/10/2014
TONYA HOWELL vs JESSICA MARLOW ET AL
2014CVG00164 ARIC KINCAID, ET AL 3/10/2014
SAMPSON M BOWER vs ARIC KINCAID, ET AL
2014CVI00115 JESSICA R PENNINGTON LUCAS 3/7/2014
CAROLINE N ALBERT vs JESSICA R PENNINGTON LUCAS
2013CVF01104 CHASTETI B TAYLOR 3/7/2014
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA KAY JEWELERS vs CHASTETI B TAYLOR
2013CVF00138 CYNTHIA E WILLIAMS 3/7/2014
MSW CAPITAL LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs CYNTHIA E WILLIAMS
2007CVF00034 JEFFREY L BATTLES 3/7/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JEFFREY L BATTLES
2013CVF00342 ALLIANCE MILLWORK AND MANUFACTURING LLC 3/7/2014
MDFRITZ INC C/O JASON T FORBES, ATTORNEY AT LAW vs ALLIANCE MILLWORK AND MANUFACTURIN...
2008CVF01767 FREIDA CHEVER 3/7/2014
HOKE ROAD DENTAL CARE vs FREIDA CHEVER
2010CVF00238 SARAH E CERCONE 3/7/2014
DISCOVER BANK vs SARAH E CERCONE
2013CVF01018 KELLY HEATING & AIR 3/7/2014
ROBERT L ROARK vs KELLY HEATING & AIR
2014CVG00161 MIRIAM AMAYA PANIAGUA AND CESAR POSADA LEON AND MA... 3/6/2014
FRIEDMAN INTEGRATED REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS vs MIRIAM AMAYA PANIAGUA and CESAR POSADA L...

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 459, 460, 461 ... 533, 534, 535  Next