Daily Law Journal
9882 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2013CVI00902 HUBER HOME RENTALS 11/20/2013
RONALD P EVANS vs HUBER HOME RENTALS
2013CVG00970 JAMES L GLENN, ET AL 11/20/2013
HANK RICHARDSON vs JAMES L GLENN, ET AL
2013CVH00946 FRANKLIN CALTRIDER REGISTRAR, BMV 11/19/2013
LUCIANO P MONTOYA vs FRANKLIN CALTRIDER REGISTRAR, BMV
2013CVF00586 SUSAN MULLINS 11/18/2013
CBCS vs SUSAN MULLINS
2013CVG00959 SHAWN BAIRD, ET AL 11/18/2013
TRICIA SHEPHERD vs SHAWN BAIRD, ET AL
2013CVI00896 PAMELA JONES 11/18/2013
SIDNEY BOOKER and PATRICIA IVORY vs PAMELA JONES
2013CVG00958 PAMELA D COLE 11/18/2013
PAUL KANDELL vs PAMELA D COLE
2012CVR00803 BRENDA HARRIS HANEY 11/18/2013
MAXINE HALLUMS and JOYCE SINGLETON vs BRENDA HARRIS HANEY
2013CVG00966 GILBERT C HALL AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GILBERT C. HA... 11/18/2013
WADE L. MILLER, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE MILLER FAMILY LIVING TRUST vs GILBERT C HAL...
2013CVG00957 SINKA FAIR, ET AL AND SHAWN KENNERLY, ET AL 11/18/2013
TURNAROUND MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O SYLVESTER vs SINKA FAIR, ET AL and SHAWN KENNERLY, ET...
2013CVG00930 MOHAMMAD RAIHENI DBA ZAM CRICKET 11/18/2013
CXA CORPORATION C/O ACKERMANN GROUP vs MOHAMMAD RAIHENI DBA ZAM CRICKET
2013CVG00968 KEVIN PENNEY AND LEANNE PENNEY, ET AL 11/18/2013
BOWSER-LEATHERMAN LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO PAUL & CAROLYN LEATHERMAN, C/O CAROLYN...
2011CVF00437 JASON L MARTIN 11/15/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs JASON L MARTIN
2013CVG00684 STAR ANDERSON, ET AL 11/15/2013
GARY WHITAKER vs STAR ANDERSON, ET AL
2013CVG00960 MATT BLAIR AND JESSA BLAIR 11/14/2013
B JOHN PAWLAK vs MATT BLAIR and JESSA BLAIR
2013CVG00955 TANDACE RICHARDSON 11/14/2013
PINE RUN TOWNHOMES vs TANDACE RICHARDSON
2013CVG00956 EMILY M ELLISTON 11/14/2013
PINE RUN TOWNHOMES vs EMILY M ELLISTON
2013CVG00954 LEON LEE 11/14/2013
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES INC vs LEON LEE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 436, 437, 438 ... 493, 494, 495  Next