Daily Law Journal
10928 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2018 CVI 01736 W AND 2/14/2019
STEAM LITE LLC vs and
2018 CVI 01721 W LAWRENCE MCKEE 2/14/2019
JACQUELINE D FISHER vs LAWRENCE MCKEE
2019 CVG 00130 W LATRICIA D JOHNSON 2/14/2019
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC. vs LATRICIA D JOHNSON
2018 CVI 01598 E CHRIS COUCH 2/13/2019
SHARON A WITHAM vs CHRIS COUCH
2019 CVG 00164 E SHAYAUNNA HENDERSON AND ERIC PHILLIP BLAIR JR 2/13/2019
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs SHAYAUNNA HENDERSON and ERIC PHILLIP BLAIR JR
2019 CVG 00163 E RACHEL COCHRAN AND PRESTON ALEXANDER 2/13/2019
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs RACHEL COCHRAN and PRESTON ALEXANDER
2019 CVG 00162 E JAY FINLEY 2/13/2019
DENIZEN MANAGMENT dba EAST POINT APARTMENTS, LLC vs JAY FINLEY
2018 CVH 01827 E MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER 2/13/2019
JULIAN C BARRIGA vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER
2018 CVF 01173 W APRIL HOPKINS 2/12/2019
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC. & DAYTON PHYSICIANS/URO vs APRIL HOPKINS
2018 CVG 01160 W KAREN JAMISON 2/12/2019
FREDERICK PERDUE vs KAREN JAMISON
2018 CVF 01634 W STEVEN MATTIS 2/12/2019
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs STEVEN MATTIS
2018 CVF 01182 W VILLAGRAPHX, LLC 2/12/2019
FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. vs VILLAGRAPHX, LLC
2019 CVG 00141 E TYLER ROBERTS 2/11/2019
PENNSWOOD DRIVE APARTMENTS LLC vs TYLER ROBERTS
2019 CVG 00140 E ANTHONY BRIDGES 2/11/2019
PENNSWOOD DRIVE APARTMENTS LLC vs ANTHONY BRIDGES
2019 CVG 00075 E HELEN ODOM 2/11/2019
WOODSVIEW INVESTMENTS, LTD vs HELEN ODOM
2018 CVF 01628 E LAUNA EBY 2/11/2019
DISCOVER BANK vs LAUNA EBY
2019 CVG 00103 W SAJAE EVERHART 2/7/2019
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs SAJAE EVERHART
2019 CVG 00102 W JERICA BAILEY 2/7/2019
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs JERICA BAILEY

Previous  1, 2, 3, 4 ... 545, 546, 547  Next