17436 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00481Â W | SARA BROWN | 4/26/2017 | |||||||
FREEDOM FOR LIVING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs SARA BROWN | |||||||||
2017Â CVHÂ 00218Â W | ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | 4/25/2017 | |||||||
MELISSA R STONE vs ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | |||||||||
2017Â CVHÂ 00419Â W and | ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | 4/24/2017 | |||||||
KATHLEEN CUMMINS vs ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00431Â W | AMY WEINLAND | 4/24/2017 | |||||||
PAMELA CURRY vs AMY WEINLAND | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00453Â W | JAMES KELLEY, JR. | 4/24/2017 | |||||||
NEW LEBANON MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs JAMES KELLEY, JR. | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00454Â W | JOHN ROBBINS AND EDNA ROBBINS | 4/24/2017 | |||||||
NEW LEBANON MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs JOHN ROBBINS and EDNA ROBBINS | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00455Â W | JAMES COFFEE | 4/24/2017 | |||||||
NEW LEBANON MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs JAMES COFFEE | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00456Â W | ANGELA LUCKY | 4/24/2017 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC. vs ANGELA LUCKY | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00454Â E | VALERI WEST | 4/20/2017 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs VALERI WEST | |||||||||
2017Â CVIÂ 00275Â W | KYLE KISER | 4/20/2017 | |||||||
MEGAN N PIEKUTOWSKI vs KYLE KISER | |||||||||
2016Â CVFÂ 00567Â W | STARK WRECKING CO., INC | 4/20/2017 | |||||||
VECTREN ENERGY DELIVERY OF OHIO, INC vs STARK WRECKING CO., INC | |||||||||
2016Â CVFÂ 00560Â E | CHRIS SCOTT AND TAMIKA SCOTT | 4/19/2017 | |||||||
DONALD W MARCUM vs CHRIS SCOTT and TAMIKA SCOTT | |||||||||
2017Â CVIÂ 00317Â E | HOLIDAY INN | 4/19/2017 | |||||||
MEAGAN PAXTON vs HOLIDAY INN | |||||||||
2010Â CVFÂ 00686Â E | MICHELLE A WARRIX | 4/19/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHELLE A WARRIX | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00295Â E | JOY M WALLACE | 4/19/2017 | |||||||
ANNA KISSICK vs JOY M WALLACE | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00456Â E | TANYA CANADA AND JULIUS GARRETT | 4/19/2017 | |||||||
JEFFERY RICHMOND vs TANYA CANADA and JULIUS GARRETT | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00457Â E | ALEX V BRUCE | 4/19/2017 | |||||||
BRUCE B BRUCE vs ALEX V BRUCE | |||||||||
2017Â CVFÂ 00105Â W | NYRTISTENE WILLIAMS | 4/17/2017 | |||||||
SHIRLEY VANCE vs NYRTISTENE WILLIAMS | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00392Â W | JUSTIN BROWN | 4/17/2017 | |||||||
KENSINGTON SQUARE vs JUSTIN BROWN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 607, 608, 609 ... 870, 871, 872 Next |