17377 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017Â CVRÂ 00702Â E | SOPHIA BUCKLEY | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
BROOKE SMITH vs SOPHIA BUCKLEY | |||||||||
2016Â CVFÂ 00110Â E | ERIC C HUGHES | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
REALMARK WAYNE LLC vs ERIC C HUGHES | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00770Â W | DARIN NICODEMUS | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
KEVIN EIKENBERRY vs DARIN NICODEMUS | |||||||||
2016Â CVFÂ 01394Â W | EMILY C HALL | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC. vs EMILY C HALL | |||||||||
2017Â CVIÂ 00418Â W | JOAN L RUCKER | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
REGINALD C JONES vs JOAN L RUCKER | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00724Â E | JOSHUA MOWEN | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JOSHUA MOWEN | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00725Â E | CHAD DORNON AND FAITH JACKSON | 6/22/2017 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs CHAD DORNON and FAITH JACKSON | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00709Â E | APRIL HAYS AND ERIC HAYS | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
HAPPY HOMES REALTY CO. vs APRIL HAYS and ERIC HAYS | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00749Â W | JOANNE COLWELL | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
BROOK RIDGE APARTMENTS vs JOANNE COLWELL | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00616Â W | KAREN JAMISON | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
FREDERICK PERDUE vs KAREN JAMISON | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00728Â E | ATAUL OSAMA | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
COLONIAL VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs ATAUL OSAMA | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00722Â E | BRIANNA N ROBERSON | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
DANIEL M SHEETS vs BRIANNA N ROBERSON | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00719Â E | CHRIS LUCKNER | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
PAUL FIAMENGO vs CHRIS LUCKNER | |||||||||
2017Â CVGÂ 00718Â E | LISA SIZEMORE | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
J.L. ZIMMERMAN REALTY vs LISA SIZEMORE | |||||||||
2014Â CVIÂ 00490Â E | BONNIE MIKESELL | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
CITY OF RIVERSIDE vs BONNIE MIKESELL | |||||||||
2012Â CVFÂ 01031Â E | CORNELIA GULLETTE | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
REALMARK CORP C/O WAYNE ESTATES vs CORNELIA GULLETTE | |||||||||
2017Â CVIÂ 00421Â E | CARISSA COUCH AND JIMMY COUCH | 6/21/2017 | |||||||
MEGAN ENGLE vs CARISSA COUCH and JIMMY COUCH | |||||||||
2016Â CVHÂ 00832Â W | ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | 6/20/2017 | |||||||
WILLIAM J TEVERBAUGH vs ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | |||||||||
2016Â CVFÂ 01391Â W | SONYA WALKER AKA MCLEMORE | 6/19/2017 | |||||||
HEARTLAND HEALTHCARE SERVICES vs SONYA WALKER AKA MCLEMORE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 585, 586, 587 ... 867, 868, 869 Next |