Daily Law Journal
10928 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2012CVF01238 MEGAN FREE AND DAVID FREE 9/4/2013
MID OHIO ACCEPTANCE CORP vs MEGAN FREE and DAVID FREE
2013CVF00464 DOYLE M WARE 8/30/2013
DAYTON SENIOR CARE LLC DBA FRIENDSHIP VILLAGE vs DOYLE M WARE
2013CVG00709 JOSEPH TONELLO 8/29/2013
GOLD KEY REALTY vs JOSEPH TONELLO
2013CVG00737 CHRISTPUS JACOBS 8/29/2013
GOLD KEY REALTY vs CHRISTPUS JACOBS
2013CVG00710 ANTHONY ARNOLD 8/29/2013
GOLD KEY REALTY vs ANTHONY ARNOLD
2013CVG00713 JESSICA L JOHNSON 8/29/2013
FLYNN REALTY, INC vs JESSICA L JOHNSON
2013CVG00711 JAMES RANDALL 8/29/2013
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO vs JAMES RANDALL
2013CVG00716 MARY E GAMON AND CHAD KARPF 8/29/2013
RONALD FULTZ vs MARY E GAMON and CHAD KARPF
2013CVG00714 SHARI CHESTNUT 8/29/2013
PHILLIP HOSKINS vs SHARI CHESTNUT
2013CVI00638 RON DEAK 8/29/2013
BRENTT A HOGAN vs RON DEAK
2013CVG00699 DARIONNE MILLION AND D'AMBER MILLION 8/29/2013
FREEDOM FOR LIFE INVESTMENTS vs DARIONNE MILLION and D'AMBER MILLION
2013CVG00708 TIM WOLF 8/29/2013
NATHAN CASTLE and MINERVA CASTLE vs TIM WOLF
2013CVG00664 ROBIN BATTLE 8/29/2013
KAREN WOOTEN vs ROBIN BATTLE
2013CVG00715 JESSICA MASSIE AND JUSTIN HOWARD 8/29/2013
EARL F SIMONE vs JESSICA MASSIE and JUSTIN HOWARD
2013CVG00712 AARON R MARSHALL AND AIMEE R MARSHALL 8/29/2013
DOUGLAS P LARGER vs AARON R MARSHALL and AIMEE R MARSHALL
2013CVR00602 COVENANT MANOR APARTMENTS 8/28/2013
WM. EDWARD A MILLER vs COVENANT MANOR APARTMENTS
2013CVG00644 WILLIAM E MILLER 8/28/2013
COVENANT MANOR INC. vs WILLIAM E MILLER
2013CVG00695 JOHN DOE, ET AL 8/26/2013
RCF PROPERTIES INC. vs JOHN DOE, ET AL
2013CVG00698 DANYELLE EDWARDS, ET AL 8/26/2013
PATHFINDERS REALTY, INC vs DANYELLE EDWARDS, ET AL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 519, 520, 521 ... 545, 546, 547  Next