Daily Law Journal
11336 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2013CVF00757 CARRIE HESTER 1/8/2014
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs CARRIE HESTER
2013CVG01071 PORSCHA SMITH ET AL 1/8/2014
RUBEN DIXON vs PORSCHA SMITH ET AL
2013CVG01081 ANNETTE HAMERTER AND PAUL HAMERTER 1/8/2014
FRANK R SPENCER and LAMEIKA SPENCER vs ANNETTE HAMERTER and PAUL HAMERTER
2013CVG01074 LATOYA JOHNSON ET AL 1/8/2014
WOODLAND HILLS APARTMENTS vs LATOYA JOHNSON ET AL
2013CVG01083 PAMELA CAWLEY ET AL 1/8/2014
WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS vs PAMELA CAWLEY ET AL
2013CVG01084 LASHAUNDA JOHNSON ET AL 1/8/2014
WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS vs LASHAUNDA JOHNSON ET AL
2013CVI01074 CHARLIE CULP 1/6/2014
JEFFERY L CARSON vs CHARLIE CULP
2013CVI01076 JONATHAN T LAURENT 1/6/2014
DAVID M RINI vs JONATHAN T LAURENT
2013CVI01078 BIG O TOWING 1/6/2014
NICOLLE SHAFFER vs BIG O TOWING
2013CVI01082 PAUL HOUSTON 1/6/2014
REBECCA SMITH vs PAUL HOUSTON
2013CVI01001 JOSH BULLOCK AND HENDERSON TURF FARM 1/6/2014
HIDDEN ACRE FARMS, LLC vs JOSH BULLOCK and HENDERSON TURF FARM
2013CVG01070 CHERYL L DAVIS, ET AL 1/6/2014
D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III C/O WHITAKER PROPERTIES vs CHERYL L DAVIS, ET AL
2009CVF00297 TANEISHA A VEAL 1/6/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TANEISHA A VEAL
2013CVF00892 JAMES R STECK AKA JAMES RICHARD STECK 1/6/2014
FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. vs JAMES R STECK AKA JAMES RICHARD STECK
2013CVG01124 EDDIE BIRKINS 1/2/2014
VIC GREEN REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs EDDIE BIRKINS
2013CVG01107 DENISE L HOCKEY 1/2/2014
HRE INVESTMENTS LLC vs DENISE L HOCKEY
2013CVG01108 DENNIS ADAMS AND KAMERON COLLIER AND RACHI REEVES 1/2/2014
GOLD KEY REALTY vs DENNIS ADAMS and KAMERON COLLIER and RACHI REEVES
2011CVF01215 BARBARA A CLARK 12/27/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs BARBARA A CLARK
2013CVG01088 DENNIS SANDERS AND TOTANY R JONES 12/26/2013
REALMARK CORP vs DENNIS SANDERS and TOTANY R JONES

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 517, 518, 519 ... 565, 566, 567  Next